This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 13:36:55 (UTC).

TOLBERT, BRANDON DARRELL

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 TOLBERT, BRANDON DARRELL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendant

TOLBERT, BRANDON DARRELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SMALL, CHRISTOPHER D

CAMPBELL, ALLAN

 

Court Documents

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

04/09/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

03/16/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/13/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

07/06/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/04/2017 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

09/13/2018 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/06/2017 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

06/11/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

09/04/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY on 10/22/2018 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Text: 1, 3, 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE); Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 10/22/2018 9:00 AM; Text: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY 10/22/2018 9:00 AM HILL, MARK J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 10/09/2018 8:45 AM CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE); Text: 10/9/2018 8:45 AM CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE) HILL, MARK J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2C6) GRAND THEFT AUTO; Text: 812.014(2c6); Count: 4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: 810.02(2B) ARMED BURGLARY; Text: 810.02(2b); Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketDescription: 812.13(2A) ARMED ROBBERY; Text: 812.13(2a); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT - STATUTORY PROPERTY; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi; Count: 4; Statute: 812.014(2c); Disposition Date: 2018-10-15; Offense Date: 2017-06-06; Offence Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeDescription: PRINCIPAL TO HOME-INVASION ROBBERY WHILE ARMED; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi; Count: 3; Statute: 812.135; Disposition Date: 2018-10-15; Offense Date: 2017-06-06; Offence Level: FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ChargeDescription: CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT HOME-INVASION ROBBERY; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi; Count: 1; Statute: 812.135; Disposition Date: 2018-10-15; Offense Date: 2017-06-06; Offence Level: FS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMALL, CHRISTOPHER D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL, ALLAN