This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 00:47:53 (UTC).

STONE, MELISSA JO

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 STONE, MELISSA JO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

STONE, MELISSA JO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GEURIN, DUSTAN M

CORTINA, KRISTIN AUBREY

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARREST; SERVED

06/17/2019 PROBABLE CAUSE VIOLATION OF PROBATION ARREST; SERVED

CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $1427.50/ 28 PAYMENTS @ $50.00 PER MTH/ SCHEDULE ISSUED

10/29/2018 CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE; $1427.50/ 28 PAYMENTS @ $50.00 PER MTH/ SCHEDULE ISSUED

BOND DISCHARGED

10/29/2018 BOND DISCHARGED

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

09/10/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/07/2018 RETURN OF SERVICE

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/04/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

08/30/2018 NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

05/25/2018 STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/30/2018 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/26/2018 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

04/26/2018 INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

04/04/2018 NOTICE TO PRODUCE

BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 1

04/03/2018 BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

04/03/2018 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

04/03/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/16/2019

FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-12-16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2019

DocketDescription: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019

DocketDescription: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2019

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT; Book: 5309; Page: 341

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 120 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 26 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Preparation & Satisfaction Fee ($17); Amount Due: 17.0; Balance: 17.0; Due Date: 2019-11-05; In Judgement: 2019-07-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 150.0; Balance: 150.0; Due Date: 2019-11-05; In Judgement: 2019-07-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Lien; Amount Due: 550.0; Balance: 550.0; Due Date: 2019-11-05; In Judgement: 2019-07-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
140 More Docket Entries
04/26/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 4/30/2018 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM NACKE, MARK A; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 4/30/2018 8:30 AM NACKE, MARK A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2018

DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2018-10-29; Offense Date: 2018-04-02; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Admit VOP; Plea Date: 2019-07-08

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018

BondBond #: X6-0360384; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: A AMERICAN BONDING- GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Closed Date: 2018-10-29; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2018

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 180045626

[+] Read More [-] Read Less