This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 12:10:35 (UTC).

STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RADA, CARY F. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RADA, CARY F

 

Party Details

Defendant

STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EL RHARRAFI, ABDELFETTAH

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION

10/03/2019: ORDER DENYING MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION IN LIMINE

10/02/2019: MOTION IN LIMINE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

10/02/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

INFORMATION FILED

10/01/2019: INFORMATION FILED

MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

10/01/2019: MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

10/01/2019: MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

09/10/2019: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

08/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

08/20/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

08/20/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

08/20/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5361; Page: 1485

10/22/2019 CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5361; Page: 1485

FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES

10/21/2019 FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

10/21/2019 DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

10/21/2019 WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

10/10/2019 ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2020-01-02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: 4C; Room: COURTROOM 4C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5361; Page: 1485

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA DOCKET 10/21/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA 10/21/2019 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 11/4/2019 1:30:00 PM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA; Location: 4C; Room: COURTROOM 4C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Costs of Incarceration (960.293); Amount Due: 3000.0; Balance: 3000.0; Due Date: 2019-12-26; In Judgement: 2019-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2019-12-26; In Judgement: 2019-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2019-12-26; In Judgement: 2019-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE DOCKET 11/4/2019 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM; Text: PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE 11/4/2019 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 09/26/2019 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM; Text: PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 09/26/2019 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2019-12-26; In Judgement: 2019-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2019-10-21; Offense Date: 2019-08-19; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-10-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190111615

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EL RHARRAFI, ABDELFETTAH