This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 12:05:03 (UTC).

STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendant

STILLWELL, STEVEN LAWRENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TREMEL, MICHAEL TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

JUDGE'S REVIEW FORM -; PER JUDGE: DEFT IS REP BY ATTY; FILE ONLY

09/23/2019: JUDGE'S REVIEW FORM -; PER JUDGE: DEFT IS REP BY ATTY; FILE ONLY

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

09/23/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

09/16/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/16/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

08/21/2019: WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

08/20/2019 FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

08/20/2019 NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

08/20/2019 ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

08/20/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; 1, 2

10/07/2019: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; 1, 2

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/23/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

09/18/2019: PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

NOTICE SENT TO DEFT RETURNED:; NO MAIL RECEPTACLE

08/28/2019: NOTICE SENT TO DEFT RETURNED:; NO MAIL RECEPTACLE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

08/23/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

08/21/2019: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

SCHEDULING LETTER

08/21/2019 SCHEDULING LETTER

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

08/20/2019 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

08/15/2019 AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT on 10/21/2019 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; Text: 1, 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE'S REVIEW FORM -; Text: PER JUDGE: DEFT IS REP BY ATTY; FILE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 10/21/2019 8:30 AM; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 10/21/2019 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PRO SE MOTION; Text: TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190108492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2019-10-07; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2019-10-07; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: 784.03(2) BATTERY SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE; Text: 784.03(2); Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketDescription: 784.021(1A) AGGRAVATED ASSAULT W/DEADLY WEAPON; Text: 784.021(1a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • ChargeDescription: BATTERY SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 2; Statute: 784.03(2); Disposition Date: 2019-10-07; Offense Date: 2019-08-12; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-08-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • ChargeDescription: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT W/DEADLY WEAPON; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 1; Statute: 784.021(1a); Disposition Date: 2019-10-07; Offense Date: 2019-08-12; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-08-23

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TREMEL, M. TAYLOR