This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 08:44:16 (UTC).

STEWART, TRISTAN J

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 STEWART, TRISTAN J was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

STEWART, TRISTAN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GEURIN, DUSTAN M

PAYNE, MONA ROSEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/24/2019

HearingEvent Type: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketDescription: DEFENDANT TO RECEIVE CREDIT FROM APRIL 4, 2019 TO AUGUST 5, 2019; Text: Defendant to receive credit from April 4, 2019 to August 5, 2019 Defendant to receive credit from April 4, 2019 to August 5, 2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketDescription: DEFENSE MOTION TO GIVE CREDIT FROM TIME OF SEMINOLE COUNTY WARRANT DETENTION ADDIFAVIT (HOLD) - NO OBJ - GRANTED; Text: Defense Motion to give credit from time of Seminole County Warrant detention addifavit (hold) - No Obj - Granted Defense Motion to give credit from time of Seminole County Warrant detention addifavit (hold) - No Obj - Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT; Text: DEFENDANT PRESENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2019

DocketDescription: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019

DocketDescription: SET ON CFMTN - MOTION HEARING DOCKET 9/24/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R; Text: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING 9/24/2019 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2019

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2019

DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: TO GIVE CREDIT FROM TIME OF SEMINOLE COUNTY WARRANT DETENTION AFFIDAVIT (HOLD)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/03/2019

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
76 More Docket Entries
06/18/2019

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190034357

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2019

DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER 2018-56-A DATED 05/21/2019; Text: SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J BAXLEY, JAMES R Per Admin Order 2018-56-A dated 05/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2019-08-05; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2019-08-05; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketDescription: 817.568(2) CRIMINAL USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Text: 817.568(2); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketDescription: 812.014(2B) GRAND THEFT; Text: 812.014(2b); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2019

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2019

ChargeDescription: POSSESS FICTITIOUS/COUNTERFEIT/UNAUTHORIZED DRIVERS LICENSE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 322.212(1a); Disposition Date: 2019-08-05; Offense Date: 2019-03-06; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-08-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2019

ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT - STATUTORY PROPERTY; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2c); Disposition Date: 2019-08-05; Offense Date: 2019-03-06; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-08-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less