This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 02/28/2022 at 16:46:37 (UTC).

SOUTHERLAND, DWIGHT SCOTT

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 SOUTHERLAND, DWIGHT SCOTT was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

SOUTHERLAND, DWIGHT SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ARCHER, LENIS

BOYLSTON, BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

03/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

04/27/2021: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

01/13/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: GRANTING DEFENDANT'S PRO-SE MOTION TO CORRECT JAIL TIME CREDIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketDescription: PRO SE MOTION; Text: TO JAIL TIME CREDIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketDescription: JUDGE'S REVIEW FORM -

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2022

DocketDescription: COMMUNICATION FROM; Text: SAO, DEFENSE ATTY, JA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketDescription: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2022

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5877; Page: 2169

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2022

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2022

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

HearingEvent Type: CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 249 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
96 More Docket Entries
04/27/2021

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 05/24/2021 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 05/24/2021 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

ArrestArresting Agency: LADY LAKE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C40; Incident #: L21002954

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2021

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2021-12-30; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2021

DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2021

DocketDescription: 812.014(2C1) GRAND THEFT; Text: 812.014(2C1); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/05/2021
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2021

ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT-$750 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5,000; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2C1); Disposition Date: 2021-12-30; Offense Date: 2021-02-28; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-12-30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less