This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 12/16/2020 at 08:15:24 (UTC).

ROSENDAHL, JIMMY TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 ROSENDAHL, JIMMY TAYLOR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROSENDAHL, JIMMY TAYLOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GEURIN, DUSTAN M

EL RHARRAFI, ABDELFETTAH

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

11/20/2020: INFORMATION FILED

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/18/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

11/18/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

11/18/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

01/19/2021

HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2021

HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020

DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020

DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 01/19/2021 9:00 AM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: 01/19/2021 9:00 AM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER BAXLEY, JAMES R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020

DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 01/12/2021 8:30 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Text: 01/12/2021 8:30 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) BAXLEY, JAMES R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2020

DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
11/18/2020

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2020-11-18; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-12-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2020-11-25; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2020-11-25; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 200130609

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2020-11-19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketDescription: 918.13(1)(A) DESTRUCTION OF EVIDENCED; Text: 918.13(1)(a); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less