This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 12:08:59 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, JUAN

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 RODRIGUEZ, JUAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NACKE, MARK A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NACKE, MARK A

 

Party Details

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SHROPA, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

08/08/2017 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

INFORMATION FILED

08/29/2017 INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

10/13/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE

11/16/2017 PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE

PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

11/16/2017 PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

FILED:; CASE SUMMARY FILED BY DEFT

11/16/2017 FILED:; CASE SUMMARY FILED BY DEFT

PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS

11/30/2017 PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS

PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS

12/01/2017 PRO SE MOTION; TO SUPPRESS

PRAECIPE(S) & SUBPOENA(S)

12/05/2017 PRAECIPE(S) & SUBPOENA(S)

PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

12/07/2017 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

01/03/2018 STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

01/04/2018 STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

PRAECIPE(S) & SUBPOENA(S)

01/05/2018 PRAECIPE(S) & SUBPOENA(S)

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2018 RETURN OF SERVICE

PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

01/09/2018 PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

01/09/2018 PRO SE MOTION; TO DISMISS

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketDescription: EVIDENCE INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-04-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5057; Page: 66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 158 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) POSSESSION OF DRUG PARPAHERNALIA; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE (ALPRAZOLAM); Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2), $0.00; Text: A23S30P 8/7/2017 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.34(2) $0.00; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketDescription: 322.34(2) DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED FOR DUI; Text: 322.34(2); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARPAHERNALIA; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 3; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2018-01-11; Offense Date: 2017-08-07; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-01-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF ALPRAZOLAM; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2018-01-11; Offense Date: 2017-08-07; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-01-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ChargeDescription: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED 1 OR MORE PRIOR OFFENSES; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 322.34(2b); Disposition Date: 2018-01-11; Offense Date: 2017-08-07; Citation: A23S30P; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-01-11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • ArrestArresting Agency: EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C4; Incident #: E17080690

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHROPA, CHRISTOPHER