This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 15:31:43 (UTC).

ROBERSON, DAVID BRIAN

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 ROBERSON, DAVID BRIAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RADA, CARY F and CURINGTON, EMILY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RADA, CARY F

CURINGTON, EMILY

 

Party Details

Defendant

ROBERSON, DAVID BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EL RHARRAFI, ABDELFETTAH

BARTHELEMY, ANDREW LEVI

ATCACHUNAS, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

02/07/2020: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY United States Fire Insurance Company; Count: 1

02/04/2020: BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY United States Fire Insurance Company; Count: 1

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

02/04/2020: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

01/29/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

AGREEMENT TO APPEAR

01/29/2020: AGREEMENT TO APPEAR

DEFENDANT PRESENT

01/29/2020: DEFENDANT PRESENT

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

01/24/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/24/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT FILED

01/16/2020: AFFIDAVIT FILED

BOND DISCHARGED

01/28/2021: BOND DISCHARGED

MOTION TO WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

06/18/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

06/18/2020: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA

06/18/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

06/16/2020: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/11/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT (DUPLICATE)

04/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT (DUPLICATE)

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

04/07/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Book: 5633; Page: 2190

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAID $712.50 ON RECEIPT 2614530, FULLY PAID; Text: $712.50 2614530 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: COP - CHANGE OF PLEA; Location: TAVARES; Room: EC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 100.0; Amount Paid: 100.0; Due Date: 2021-02-02; In Judgement: 2021-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Amount Paid: 22.0; Due Date: 2021-02-02; In Judgement: 2021-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Amount Paid: 223.0; Due Date: 2021-02-02; In Judgement: 2021-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Discretionary Fine (with 5% surcharge); Amount Due: 367.5; Amount Paid: 367.5; Due Date: 2021-02-02; In Judgement: 2021-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5633; Page: 1453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: GO TO TRAFFIC WNDW/INFO DSK; Text: Go To Traffic Wndw/Info Dsk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: PD TEMPORARILY APPOINTED; Text: PD Temp. Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON ARR1 - ARRAIGNMENT RADA DOCKET 01/29/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: ARR1 - ARRAIGNMENT RADA 01/29/2020 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld by Judge; Count: 1; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2021-01-28; Offense Date: 2020-01-15; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-01-28

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EL RHARRAFI, ABDELFETTAH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTHELEMY, ANDREW LEVI