This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/04/2020 at 07:53:44 (UTC).

RIVERA, JESSICA MARIA

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 RIVERA, JESSICA MARIA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

RIVERA, JESSICA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REIDER, NICHOLAS D

KIM, JAE HEE

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

03/11/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

02/21/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/24/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

12/30/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

12/09/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

11/15/2019: WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Bench Warrant

10/29/2019: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Bench Warrant

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

10/29/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT - OUT OF COUNTY

03/12/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT - OUT OF COUNTY

MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

02/21/2020: MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

02/24/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)

01/02/2020: ORDER RELEASING DEFENDANT ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE (ROR)

MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

01/02/2020: MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

[REVISED] MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

12/30/2019: [REVISED] MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/14/2019: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

11/14/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/14/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; Text: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: PRO SE CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Text: FILE W/COPIES TO SAO & DEF ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 06/15/2020 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: 06/15/2020 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 06/02/2020 8:45 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Text: 06/02/2020 8:45 AM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 10; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 9; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 8; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 7; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 6; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 5; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 4; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 3; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-11-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 2; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-11-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Count: 1; Statute: 817.568(2A); Offense Date: 2019-09-01; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-11-22

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, JAE HEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REIDER, NICHOLAS D