This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 20:27:25 (UTC).

REYNOLDS, MORRIS LEE

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 REYNOLDS, MORRIS LEE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, MARK J and BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, MARK J

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

REYNOLDS, MORRIS LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARRANZA, MORRIS

CONAN, MARK

BUXMAN, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 4

04/15/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 4

ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

04/06/2020: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

MOTION; AUTHORIZING DISCLOSURE AND USE OF AUTOPSY MATERIALS

03/16/2020: MOTION; AUTHORIZING DISCLOSURE AND USE OF AUTOPSY MATERIALS

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

03/16/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND/OR ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL AND/OR BLOOD RECORDS

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND/OR ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF MEDICAL AND/OR BLOOD RECORDS

SCHEDULING LETTER

02/14/2020: SCHEDULING LETTER

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

02/14/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

02/14/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

02/14/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/16/2021: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

01/13/2021: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #9

11/30/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #9

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

11/23/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MOTION TO TRANSPORT INMATE

10/28/2020: MOTION TO TRANSPORT INMATE

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

10/26/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/03/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #6

07/29/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #6

MOTION TO CONTINUE; AND WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

06/24/2020: MOTION TO CONTINUE; AND WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 04/12/2021 1:30 PM CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Text: 4/12/2021 1:30 PM CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 04/06/2021 1:30 PM CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE); Text: 4/6/2021 1:30 PM CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE) BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPR - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PRIVATE); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 03/09/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 03/09/2020 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeDescription: MURDER IN THE FIRST DEGREE WITH A FIREARM - PREMEDITATED; Count: 1; Statute: 782.04(1a1); Offense Date: 2020-02-07; Offence Level: FC; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • BondType: No Bond; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2020-02-26; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: 782.04(2) MURDER OF THE 2ND DEGREE (DOMESTIC); Text: 782.04(2); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRANZA, MORRIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARK CONAN