This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/21/2022 at 05:06:06 (UTC).

NOEL, JERRY DEAN

Case Summary

On 05/25/2001 NOEL, JERRY DEAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOYLSTON, RICHARD W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOYLSTON, RICHARD W

 

Party Details

Defendant

NOEL, JERRY DEAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/24/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: COURT EDUCATIONAL COMPLETION FOR SHOPLIFTING PROGRAM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2002

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 3 days Suspended Sentence: 3 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: DEFT PRS FOR ARRA, WAIVED COUNSEL, TENDERED A PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE AS TO VOP COURT ACCEPTED SAID PLEA AND ADJUDGED DEFT GUILTY AS TO VOP. JUDGE MILLER IMPOSED A SENTENCE OF 1). 3 DAYS IN LCJ, SUSPENDED UPON COMPLETION OF CONDITIONS 2). COMPLETE SHO PLIFTING PROGRAM W/I 60 DAYS. PROBATION TERMINATED. PROOF DUE BY 050602.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: SCHEDULING LETTER TO DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER-DECLINED BY DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AGREEMENT TO APPEAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED----2/19/02 LAKE COUNTY S.O.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: $370 BAIL POSTED BY TAVARES BAIL BONDS, 418 W ALFRED STREET, 021902

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
08/29/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: DEFT PRES FOR ARRA, WAIVED COUNSEL, TENDERED A PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE AS TO VOP COURT ACCEPTED SAID PLEA AND ADJDUGED DEFT GUILTY AS TO VOP. JUDGE MILLER IMPOSED A SENTENCE OF REINSTATING PROBATION WITH ORIGINAL CONDITIONS. PROBATION TO RUN CONCURREN T WITH 01CT24540. WITHDRAW PROBATION WARRANT OR NOT ISSUE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: COUNT 01 RECEIPT 772268 $ 45.00; FINE/COST $ 0.00; SUPRV/REST/WR $ 45.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: ORDER WITHHOLDING ADJUDICATION OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: DEFT PRES FOR ARRA, WAIVED COUNSEL, TENDERED A PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE AS CHARGED, COURT ACCEPTED SAID PLEA AND WITHHELD ADJDUDICATION. JUDGE MILLER IMPOSED A SENTENCE OF 6 MONTHS PROBATION WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS; 1). COURT COST OF $130.00. 2). COMPL ETE SHOPLIFTING PROGRAM. 3). RESTITTUTION IF ANY. RESERVE RIGHT TO HEARING. EARLY TERMINATION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPL & ORDER FINDING DEF NOT INDIGENT RB 33195

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AGREEMENT TO APPEAR - SET FOR 6/6/2001 ARM @ 8:30 AM CTRM 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE BOOKED LCJ BUT ROR'D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2001

ChargeDescription: THEFT OF PUBLIC UTILITY; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 812.14; Disposition Date: 2001-06-06; Offense Date: 2001-05-22; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2001-06-06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2001

ArrestArresting Agency: GROVELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C36

[+] Read More [-] Read Less