This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/21/2020 at 00:45:48 (UTC).

NICHI, TYLOR ALEX

Case Summary

On 04/02/2018 NICHI, TYLOR ALEX was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NACKE, MARK A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NACKE, MARK A

 

Party Details

Defendant

NICHI, TYLOR ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLOAN, RAYMOND E

LINEBERGER, KENNETH LOGAN

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

04/02/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

04/02/2018 ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/02/2018 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

04/02/2018 FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

04/02/2018 INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

SCHEDULING LETTER

04/04/2018 SCHEDULING LETTER

ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/18/2018 ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

04/23/2018 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

04/23/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

INFORMATION FILED

04/23/2018 INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE SENT TO DEFT RETURNED:; RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED

04/24/2018 NOTICE SENT TO DEFT RETURNED:; RETURN TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/27/2018 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; NGA / NOT SENT

05/01/2018 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATE; NGA / NOT SENT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

05/26/2018 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

05/31/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS, AND FINES (CERTIFIED COPY FOR RECORDING); Book: 5118; Page: 628

05/31/2018 FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS, AND FINES (CERTIFIED COPY FOR RECORDING); Book: 5118; Page: 628

SENTENCE

06/05/2018 SENTENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-04-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5121; Page: 123

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CFRD - ROCKET DOCKET; Location: TAVARES; Room: MAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 120 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 62 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Lien; Amount Due: 550.0; Balance: 550.0; Due Date: 2018-09-28; In Judgement: 2018-05-31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Preparation & Satisfaction Fee ($17); Amount Due: 17.0; Balance: 17.0; Due Date: 2018-09-28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) DRUG PARAPHERNALIA - POSSESS OR USE; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) DRUGS - POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2018-05-31; Offense Date: 2018-03-31; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-05-31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2018-05-31; Offense Date: 2018-03-31; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-05-31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2018-05-31; Amount: 500.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2018-05-31; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2018
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LEESBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C1; Incident #: 18-03-0612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOAN, RAYMOND E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEBERGER, KENNETH LOGAN