This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 18:21:31 (UTC).

NEAL, LESLIE KENDELL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 NEAL, LESLIE KENDELL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELKE, BRIAN J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELKE, BRIAN J

 

Party Details

Defendant

NEAL, LESLIE KENDELL

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

03/16/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

06/04/2018

FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2018-06-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2018

DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5090; Page: 1998

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

HearingEvent Type: ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 40 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 40 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2018-05-21; In Judgement: 2018-04-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

FinancialDescription: #Lake - MM Drug and Alcohol Cost ($15); Amount Due: 15.0; Balance: 15.0; Due Date: 2018-05-21; In Judgement: 2018-04-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2018-04-05

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2018

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2018-05-21; In Judgement: 2018-04-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
03/20/2018

DocketDescription: SCHEDULING LETTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2018

DocketDescription: SET ON ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE DOCKET 04/04/2018 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE 04/04/2018 8:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketDescription: 893.147(1) NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2018

DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2018

ChargeDescription: NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2018-04-04; Offense Date: 2018-03-15; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-04-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2018

ChargeDescription: RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2018-04-04; Offense Date: 2018-03-15; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2018-04-04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2018

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 180037557

[+] Read More [-] Read Less