This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 18:44:58 (UTC).

MURPHY, ERIN CAROLINE

Case Summary

On 07/03/2018 MURPHY, ERIN CAROLINE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

MURPHY, ERIN CAROLINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLOAN, RAYMOND E

MACOMBER, KAITLYN

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

07/03/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

BOND DISCHARGED

10/04/2018 BOND DISCHARGED

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL

11/16/2018 ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 2

06/10/2019 STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 2

PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATIONS DONE ON

06/13/2019 PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATIONS DONE ON

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

06/24/2019 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

ORDER COMPENSATING EXPERT WITNESS

06/25/2019 ORDER COMPENSATING EXPERT WITNESS

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; NGA / NOT SENT

06/25/2019 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; NGA / NOT SENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFTRIAL - TRIAL DOCKET 2/10/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFTRIAL - TRIAL 2/10/2020 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE DOCKET 1/30/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 1/30/2020 9:00 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; Text: **NO GOOD ADDRESS/NOT SENT**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 11/12/2019 9:00 AM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: 11/12/2019 9:00 AM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER DAVIS, HEIDI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
200 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeDescription: DEAL STOLEN PROP.; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 4; Statute: 812.019(1); Disposition Date: 2018-10-04; Offense Date: 2018-07-02; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2018-08-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Count: 3; Statute: 893.147(1); Offense Date: 2018-07-02; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2018-08-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeDescription: PETIT THEFT 2ND OFFENSE; Count: 2; Statute: 812.014(3b); Offense Date: 2018-07-02; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2018-08-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2018-07-02; Offence Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • BondBond #: X6-0368934; Type: Surety; Count: 3; Bondsman: CLERMONT BAIL BONDS - GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Open

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • BondBond #: X6-0368936; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: CLERMONT BAIL BONDS - GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Open

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • BondBond #: X6-0368935; Type: Surety; Count: 4; Bondsman: CLERMONT BAIL BONDS - GROVELAND; Suerety Company: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Closed Date: 2018-10-04; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ArrestArresting Agency: CLERMONT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C3; Incident #: 18C21489

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACOMBER, KAITLYN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOAN, RAYMOND E