This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

MOON, CHARLES ZEBORIAH

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 MOON, CHARLES ZEBORIAH was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Defendant

MOON, CHARLES ZEBORIAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

VONER, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

05/05/2020: WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

04/23/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/20/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER CONTINUING SENTENCING DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC

03/30/2020: ORDER CONTINUING SENTENCING DUE TO COVID-19 PANDEMIC

BOND DISCHARGED

02/04/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

BOND DISCHARGED

02/04/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

12/19/2019: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

12/19/2019: NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

12/06/2019: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

12/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

12/03/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2), $0.00; AB8IA0E 12/2/2019 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.34(2) $0.00; Count: 1

12/03/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2), $0.00; AB8IA0E 12/2/2019 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.34(2) $0.00; Count: 1

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5466; Page: 2411

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA DOCKET 5/5/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA 5/5/2020 8:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: MM - PLEA IN ABSENTIA; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Costs of Incarceration (960.293); Amount Due: 3000.0; Balance: 3000.0; Due Date: 2020-07-09; In Judgement: 2020-05-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2020-07-09; In Judgement: 2020-05-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2020-07-09; In Judgement: 2020-05-05

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketDescription: 322.34(2) OPERATING WHILE DL SUSPENDED / KNOWINGLY; Text: 322.34(2); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2), $0.00; Text: AB8IA0E 12/2/2019 EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.34(2) $0.00; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2020-05-05; Offense Date: 2019-12-02; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-05-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • ChargeDescription: OPERATING WHILE DL SUSPENDED / KNOWINGLY; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 322.34(2); Disposition Date: 2020-05-05; Offense Date: 2019-12-02; Citation: AB8IA0E; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-05-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • BondBond #: AA19-606585; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: A QUICK RESPONSE BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Roche Surety and Casualty Company; Closed Date: 2019-12-19; Amount: 1000.0; Forfeiture Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • BondBond #: AA19-606584; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: A QUICK RESPONSE BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Roche Surety and Casualty Company; Closed Date: 2019-12-19; Amount: 1000.0; Forfeiture Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C4; Incident #: E19120182

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VONER, DANIEL