This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/23/2022 at 04:59:30 (UTC).

MONROE, JACK, MONROE, JACK JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2001 MONROE, JACK, MONROE, JACK JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J

 

Party Details

Defendants

MONROE, JACK JR

MONROE, JACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MEHTA, ISHIR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/07/2004

DocketDescription: SENTENCE; Text: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2004

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Text: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/23/2004

DocketDescription: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION; Text: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION - NUNC PRO TUNC - APRIL 19, 2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2004

DocketDescription: FILED:; Text: LAKE COUNTY JAIL ARREST PAPERWORK - DEFT WAS SENTENCED TO SERVE 5 MONTHS AND 29 DAYS FOR VOP/POSSESSION OF CANNABIS W/INTENT TO SELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: 7; Room: COURTROOM 7; Notes: SENTENCED ON 04/19/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 5 months 29 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 46.0; Balance: 46.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

FinancialDescription: Conversion Fee; Amount Due: 550.0; Balance: 550.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

DocketDescription: FEL PUB DEF LIEN (D.O.R. PER HB 113A); Text: FEL PUB DEF LIEN (D.O.R. PER HB 113A) Charge #1: MARIJUANA SELL-SCHEDULE I; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2004

DocketDescription: TT/CF/MM RECORDING FEE (FOR JUDGMENTS); Text: TT/CF/MM RECORDING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
01/14/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: DEFT B/M PRESENT FOR PLEA DAY-COURT ADJUDGED DEFT INDIGENT AND APPT PD-ORAL NG PLEA ENTERED-COURT GRANTED REQUEST OF PD FOR 10 DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS-CASE CONT TO 2-27-02 PNC / 3-18-02 SNT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: INFORMATION FOR:CT I POSSESSION OF CANNABIS WITH INTENT TO SELL; CT II POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: $10500 BAIL POSTED BY TRINI THOMAS BAIL BONDS, PO BOX 61, 122201

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY & APP. FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2001

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE. WARRANT SENT TO SO - BOND SET AT $10,500 TOTAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2001

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2002-05-28; Offense Date: 2001-09-21; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-05-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2001

ChargeDescription: POSS CANNABIS W/INT TO SELL/MFG/DELIVER; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty (After Withhold); Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(1a2); Disposition Date: 2002-05-28; Offense Date: 2001-09-21; Offence Level: FT; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-05-28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less