This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 12/02/2022 at 08:23:01 (UTC).

MCQUILLING, MARK MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 MCQUILLING, MARK MICHAEL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZ, LARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZ, LARRY

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCQUILLING, MARK MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VONER, DANIEL JOSEPH

UNDERKOFLER III, ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

11/04/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

11/28/2022

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022

DocketDescription: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $5,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 11/28/2022 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 11/28/2022 8:30 AM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

BondBond #: PSE21024952; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: LAKE BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Open

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

BondBond #: PSE51024898; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: LAKE BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Open

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2022-11-08; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR CONFIDENTIAL CRIME VICTIM INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: 784.03(1A1) SIMPLE BATTERY (DOMESTIC); Text: 784.03(1a1); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketDescription: 784.021(1A) AGGRAVATED ASSAULT WITH DEADLY WEAPON (DOMESTIC); Text: 784.021(1a); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

ChargeDescription: SIMPLE BATTERY (DOMESTIC); Count: 2; Statute: 784.03(1a1); Offense Date: 2022-11-03; Offence Level: MF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

ChargeDescription: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT WITH DEADLY WEAPON (DOMESTIC); Count: 1; Statute: 784.021(1a); Offense Date: 2022-11-03; Offence Level: FT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 220114895

[+] Read More [-] Read Less