This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/24/2022 at 10:59:07 (UTC).

MCCORD, WILLIAM A

Case Summary

On 02/25/2002 MCCORD, WILLIAM A was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELKE, BRIAN J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2002

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELKE, BRIAN J

 

Party Details

Defendant

MCCORD, WILLIAM A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WEEDEN, ROGER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/03/2017

DocketDescription: CASE REASSIGNED PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER L2016-33

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: MEMO:; Text: MEMO: FROM BRENDA, STATING THE JUDGE INFORM DEFENDANT MOTHER THAT THIS O/C IS NOT A BUYOUT. DEFENDANT MUST SERVE 20 DAYS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION; Text: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: Alert Served; Text: Alert Served ORDER OF COMMITMENT served on: 06/24/2004 For: MCCORD, WILLIAM A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2004

DocketDescription: ORDER OF COMMITMENT RETURNED EXECUTED; Text: ORDER OF COMMITMENT RETURNED EXECUTED ON 06/22/04.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2004

DocketDescription: ALERT ISSUED; Text: ALERT ISSUED ORDER OF COMMITMENT issued on: 06/15/2004 For: MCCORD, WILLIAM A Bond Amt: Bond Type:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2004

DocketDescription: ORDER OF COMMITMENT TO S.O.; Text: ORDER OF COMMITMENT TO S.O. (SUSPENDED SENTENCE OF 20 DAYS)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2004

DocketDescription: Alert Served; Text: Alert Served ORDER OF COMMITMENT served on: 04/13/2004 For: MCCORD, WILLIAM A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2004

DocketDescription: ORDER OF COMMITMENT RETURNED WITHDRAWN; Text: ORDER OF COMMITMENT RETURNED WITHDRAWN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2004

DocketDescription: MEMO:; Text: MEMO: FROM JUDGE MILLER W/DRAWING ORDER OF COMMITMENT FOR 30 DAYS TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO COMPLETE DRUG CLASSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
03/13/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: DEFENSE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT FILED BY ATTY WEEDEN, CASE CONTINUED UNTIL 042302 PNC AND 050202 SNT. (ORIGINAL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY; AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT FILED BY ATTY ROGER WEEDEN, 1 S. ORANGE AVE., STE. 304 ORLANDO FL 32801, CASE CONTINUED UNTIL 042302 PNC AND 050202 SNT. (FAX COPY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: $1000 BAIL POSTED BY BELTON BAIL BONDS, 322 WEST MAIN STREET, 022202

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY & APP. FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AGREEMENT TO APPEAR - SET FOR 3/13/2002 ARM @ 8:30 AM CTRM 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2002

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: ARREST AFFIDAVIT BOOKED LCJ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty (After Withhold); Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2002-12-12; Offense Date: 2002-02-22; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA, LESS THAN 20 GRAMS; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty (After Withhold); Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2002-12-12; Offense Date: 2002-02-22; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-12-12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2002

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less