This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 11:59:06 (UTC).

MCCALLA, DONTAVIOUS CLESHAY, TAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 MCCALLA, DONTAVIOUS CLESHAY, TAY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendants

MCCALLA, DONTAVIOUS CLESHAY

TAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLOAN, RAYMOND E

OLSON, SARAJANE M

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

07/31/2017 ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

07/31/2017 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

07/31/2017 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

07/31/2017 NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

07/31/2017 INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

08/09/2017 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

08/21/2017 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

BOND - AMOUNT $10,000.00, COMPANY Lexington National Insurance Corporation; Count: 1

08/21/2017 BOND - AMOUNT $10,000.00, COMPANY Lexington National Insurance Corporation; Count: 1

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/22/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

08/22/2017 NOTICE TO PRODUCE

INFORMATION FILED

08/28/2017 INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/28/2017 NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

08/28/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

08/28/2017 NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

09/18/2017 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/18/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • BondType: No Bond; Count: 1; Status: Open

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: FAILURE TO APPEAR CAPIAS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: BOND SET AT NO BOND; Text: No Bond; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: PER PD - MOTHER INFORMED PD DEFT IS IN CUSTODY IN GA; Text: PER PD - MOTHER INFORMED PD DEFT IS IN CUSTODY IN GA PER PD - MOTHER INFORMED PD DEFT IS IN CUSTODY IN GA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF BOND FORFEITURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
239 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketDescription: 794.011(4) SEX BATT - VICTIM OLDER 12 YOA/ SPECIAL; Text: 794.011(4); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2017-08-22; Amount: 10000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2017
  • ChargeDescription: SEXUAL BATTERY UPON PHYSICALLY HELPLESS PERSON; Count: 1; Statute: 794.011(4); Offense Date: 2017-07-29; Offence Level: FF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2017
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LEESBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C1; Incident #: 17-07-0550

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLSON, SARAJANE M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOAN, RAYMOND E