This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/27/2022 at 05:25:44 (UTC).

LOWRY, ROBYN R, LOWRY, ROBYN RAYE Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2003 LOWRY, ROBYN R, LOWRY, ROBYN RAYE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendants

LOWRY, ROBYN R

LOWRY, ROBYN RAYE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRAVES, MICHAEL A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/16/2019

DocketDescription: MEMORANDUM; Text: FROM PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2019

DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER 2018-56-A DATED 05/21/2019; Text: BRIGGS, DON F SINGELTARY, G RICHARD Per Admin Order 2018-56-A dated 05/21/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2004

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION; Text: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION - NUNC PRO TUNC TO 5/17/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2004

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION; Text: JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT IN COMMUNITY CONTROL - NUNC PRO TUNC - 5/17/04

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2004

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Text: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2004

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: 3; Room: COURTROOM 3; Notes: SENTENCED ON 05/17/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2004

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: 7; Room: COURTROOM 7; Notes: CONTINUED ON 05/17/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2004

SentenceTerm: Probation Time: 4 years 6 months; Sentence: Probation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2004

SentenceTerm: Probation Time: 3 years Community Control : 1 years 6 months; Sentence: Community Control

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2004

DocketDescription: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET; Text: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
01/27/2003

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT Date: 02/18/2003 Time: 8:30 am Judge: SINGELTARY, HONORABLE G RICHARD Location: COURTROOM 3 Result: CONTINUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2003

DocketDescription: ARREST BOND POSTED; Text: ARREST BOND $2,000 POSTED BY LAKE BAIL BONDS 012303

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2003

BondBond #: CONV-97032358-1; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: LAKE BAIL BONDS; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Open

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2003

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 03008292

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2003

DocketDescription: Alert Served; Text: Alert Served CAPIAS served on: 01/23/2003 For: LOWRY, ROBYN R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2003

DocketDescription: APPLICATION AND ORDER SETTING BAIL; Text: APPLICATION AND ORDER SETTING BAIL - CAPIAS TO S.O. BOND SET AT $2,000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2003

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED; Text: INFORMATION FILED: CT I UTTERING A FORGED CHECK; CT II GRAND THEFT-$300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20,000 Attorney: BARBEE JR, DONALD C (0164119)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2003

DocketDescription: ALERT ISSUED; Text: ALERT ISSUED CAPIAS issued on: 01/15/2003 For: LOWRY, ROBYN R Bond Amt: 2,000

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2002

ChargeDescription: GRAND-THEFT IS $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20,000; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty (After Withhold); Count: 2; Statute: 812.014(2c1); Disposition Date: 2003-08-11; Offense Date: 2002-07-03; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Guilty; Plea Date: 2003-08-11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2002

ChargeDescription: UTTERING A FORGED CHECK; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty (After Withhold); Count: 1; Statute: 831.02; Disposition Date: 2003-08-11; Offense Date: 2002-07-03; Sentence: Community Control; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Guilty; Plea Date: 2003-08-11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less