This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/29/2022 at 05:46:37 (UTC).

LOBALDO, JOHN MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2003 LOBALDO, JOHN MICHAEL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, DONNA F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, DONNA F

 

Party Details

Defendant

LOBALDO, JOHN MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/31/2003

HearingEvent Type: ARM - ARRAIGNMENT MILLER; Location: 2; Room: COURTROOM 2; Notes: SENTENCED ON 12/31/2003

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/31/2003

DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT FOR; Text: DEFENDANT PRESENT FOR ARRA, WAIVED COUNSEL. COURT DISMISSED CASE. CASE CLOSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2003

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: ARRAIGNMENT MILLER Date: 12/31/2003 Time: 8:30 am Judge: MILLER, HONORABLE DONNA F Location: COURTROOM 2 Charge #1: TRAFFIC OFFENSE-POSSESS DISPLAY ETC OF CANC REVOKED ETC DR LIC; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2003

DocketDescription: FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION; Text: FLORIDA UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION #4219-CNC 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2003

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION & ORDER FINDING DEFT NOT INDIGENT; Text: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION & ORDER FINDING DEFT NOT INDIGENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2003

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE; Text: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2003

ChargeDescription: TRAFFIC OFFENSE-POSSESS DISPLAY ETC OF CANC REVOKE; Disposition: Dismissed; Count: 1; Statute: 322.32(1); Disposition Date: 2003-12-31; Offense Date: 2003-12-13; Citation: 4219CNC; Offence Level: MS; Plea: No Plea Entered; Plea Date: 2003-12-31

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2003

ArrestArresting Agency: GROVELAND POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C36; Incident #: G03-12-175

[+] Read More [-] Read Less