This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 09:46:24 (UTC).

LEWIS JR, TERRY LAYNE

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 LEWIS JR, TERRY LAYNE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WELKE, BRIAN J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WELKE, BRIAN J

 

Party Details

Defendant

LEWIS JR, TERRY LAYNE

 

Court Documents

COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

10/04/2017 COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

REVOCATION FROM PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

10/04/2017 REVOCATION FROM PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

SCHEDULING LETTER

10/05/2017 SCHEDULING LETTER

**UPDATED** REVOCATION FROM PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

10/13/2017 **UPDATED** REVOCATION FROM PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

12/04/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

12/07/2017 DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

01/17/2018 WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

01/17/2018 DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 2318906, FULLY PAID; $50.00 2318906 Fully Paid

01/19/2018 PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 2318906, FULLY PAID; $50.00 2318906 Fully Paid

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP

01/22/2018 ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP

INFORMATION FILED

02/07/2018 INFORMATION FILED

NOLLE PROSEQUI - NP PREVIOUSLY FILED IN OPEN COURT

03/02/2018 NOLLE PROSEQUI - NP PREVIOUSLY FILED IN OPEN COURT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOLLE PROSEQUI - NP PREVIOUSLY FILED IN OPEN COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK on 2/12/2018 8:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • HearingEvent Type: COP - CHANGE OF PLEA; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: NOLLE PROSEQUI IN OPEN COURT; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 2318906, FULLY PAID; Text: $50.00 2318906 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDescription: SET ON TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK DOCKET 2/12/2018 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: TRI - JURY SELECTION / TRIAL WEEK 2/12/2018 8:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDescription: NO PLEA ENTERED; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDescription: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDescription: COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketDescription: SET ON ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE DOCKET 5/17/2017 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM WELKE, BRIAN J; Text: ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE 5/17/2017 8:00 AM WELKE, BRIAN J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • HearingEvent Type: ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketDescription: SET ON ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE DOCKET 5/3/2017 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM WELKE, BRIAN J; Text: ARW - ARRAIGNMENT WELKE 5/3/2017 8:00 AM WELKE, BRIAN J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi In Open Court; Count: 1; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2018-02-08; Offense Date: 2017-04-12; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Plea Entered; Plea Date: 2017-05-04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less