This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 08:44:03 (UTC).

JUAREZ, ANTONIO

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 JUAREZ, ANTONIO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

JUAREZ, ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REIDER, NICHOLAS D

KIM, JAE HEE

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION FILED

01/30/2020: INFORMATION FILED

MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

01/28/2020: MOTION; FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

01/27/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

01/27/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/21/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER OR PRIVATE ATTORNEY

01/13/2020: PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER OR PRIVATE ATTORNEY

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

01/13/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

01/13/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

12/17/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

12/17/2019: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

12/17/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS, AND FINES (CERTIFIED COPY FOR RECORDING); Book: 5422; Page: 790

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 90 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 90 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 60 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Lien; Amount Due: 550.0; Balance: 550.0; Due Date: 2020-05-13; In Judgement: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Preparation & Satisfaction Fee ($17); Amount Due: 17.0; Balance: 17.0; Due Date: 2020-05-13; In Judgement: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 150.0; Balance: 150.0; Due Date: 2020-05-13; In Judgement: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2020-05-13; In Judgement: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 418.0; Balance: 418.0; Due Date: 2020-05-13; In Judgement: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 2; Closed Date: 2020-02-13; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2020-02-13; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE - METHAMPHATAMINE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2020-02-13; Offense Date: 2019-12-16; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF METHAMPHETAMINE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Disposition Date: 2020-02-13; Offense Date: 2019-12-16; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-02-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: MASCOTTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C50; Incident #: 19MA07486

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM, JAE HEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REIDER, NICHOLAS D