This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 20:19:54 (UTC).

JONES, TRAVIS LEE

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 JONES, TRAVIS LEE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J

 

Party Details

Defendant

JONES, TRAVIS LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CORTINA, KRISTIN AUBREY

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

12/20/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

01/22/2019

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: LJS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2019

DocketDescription: Cancelled CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT on 1/22/2019 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2019

DocketDescription: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; Text: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 1/22/2019 8:30 AM; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 1/22/2019 8:30 AM SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDescription: REQUEST OF STATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2019

DocketDescription: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2019

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: SCHEDULING LETTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 1/14/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 1/14/2019 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketDescription: 784.03(2) FELONY BATTERY (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); Text: 784.03(2); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018

ChargeDescription: FELONY BATTERY (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 1; Statute: 784.03(2); Disposition Date: 2019-01-16; Offense Date: 2018-12-19; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-01-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 180166418

[+] Read More [-] Read Less