This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 09:36:45 (UTC).

HENSHAW, ANTHONY MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 HENSHAW, ANTHONY MICHAEL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendant

HENSHAW, ANTHONY MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TREMEL, MICHAEL TAYLOR

TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

04/12/2017 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

04/12/2017 ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

04/12/2017 INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

04/12/2017 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 1

04/14/2017 BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 1

BOND - AMOUNT $5,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 2

04/14/2017 BOND - AMOUNT $5,000.00, COMPANY Palmetto Surety Corporation; Count: 2

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

04/20/2017 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

BOND DISCHARGED

05/01/2017 BOND DISCHARGED

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

05/08/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

BOND DISCHARGED

08/04/2017 BOND DISCHARGED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

10/30/2018 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-10-15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: TERMINATION OF SUPERVISION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5292; Page: 1661

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 90 days Probation Time: 90 days; Sentence: Probation; Credit Time: Credit Time: 50 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2019-09-03; In Judgement: 2019-06-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 418.0; Balance: 418.0; Due Date: 2019-09-03; In Judgement: 2019-06-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • BondBond #: PSE5 55571; Type: Surety; Count: 2; Bondsman: ALL HOURS BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Closed Date: 2017-05-01; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • BondBond #: PSE5 55572; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: ALL HOURS BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Palmetto Surety Corporation; Closed Date: 2017-08-04; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: 918.13 TAMPERING W/OR FABRICATING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE; Text: 918.13; Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2C1) THEFT GRAND - $300 TO $5,000; Text: 812.014(2c1); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • ChargeDescription: TAMPERING W/OR FABRICATING PHYSICAL EVIDENCE; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 2; Statute: 918.13; Disposition Date: 2017-05-01; Offense Date: 2017-04-11; Offence Level: FT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT-$300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20000; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld by Judge; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2c1); Disposition Date: 2019-06-03; Offense Date: 2017-04-11; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-06-03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TREMEL, M. TAYLOR