This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 22:33:43 (UTC).

ESTRADA JR, ERNESTO

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 ESTRADA JR, ERNESTO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

ESTRADA JR, ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REIDER, NICHOLAS D

OUTLAW, HILLRA CHRISTOPHER

HAMBURG, KENNETH

REGIONAL-COUNSEL, A

 

Court Documents

BOND - AMOUNT $10,000.00, COMPANY United States Fire Insurance Company; Count: 2

04/16/2020: BOND - AMOUNT $10,000.00, COMPANY United States Fire Insurance Company; Count: 2

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

03/27/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

03/27/2020: INFORMATION FILED

SCHEDULING LETTER

02/20/2020: SCHEDULING LETTER

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

02/18/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

02/18/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

02/18/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2)A, $0.00; ACLQP7E 2/16/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(2)a $0.00; Count: 3

02/18/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(2)A, $0.00; ACLQP7E 2/16/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(2)a $0.00; Count: 3

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(2), $0.00; ACLQP8E 2/16/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 316.1935(2) $0.00; Count: 4

02/18/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(2), $0.00; ACLQP8E 2/16/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 316.1935(2) $0.00; Count: 4

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

11/02/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

COMMUNICATION ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT; FILE PER JUDGE

10/28/2020: COMMUNICATION ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT; FILE PER JUDGE

RETURN OF SERVICE

09/02/2020: RETURN OF SERVICE

BOND DISCHARGED

06/30/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/24/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

06/24/2020: MOTION TO REVOKE BOND

DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/03/2020: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL (CONFLICT)

05/29/2020: ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL (CONFLICT)

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

03/23/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFBH - BOND HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTRC - FELONY SENTENCING REGIONAL COUNSEL; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFBH - BOND HEARING DOCKET 4/22/2021 BEGINNING AT 2:30 PM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD; Text: CFBH - BOND HEARING 4/22/2021 2:30 PM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING; Text: (BOND)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: TO SET BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFSNTRC - FELONY SENTENCING REGIONAL COUNSEL DOCKET 4/19/2021 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD; Text: CFSNTRC - FELONY SENTENCING REGIONAL COUNSEL 4/19/2021 9:00 AM SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER on 4/19/2021 1:30:00 PM due to CHANGE TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTRC - FELONY SENTENCING REGIONAL COUNSEL; Location: TAVARES; Room: GRS

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: 790.23(1A) POSSESSION OF FIREARM BY CONVICTED FELON; Text: 790.23(1a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: 322.34(2)A DWLS; Text: 322.34(2)a; Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: 316.1935(2) FLEEING & ELUDING; Text: 316.1935(2); Count: 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT AUTO; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 5; Statute: 812.014(2c6); Disposition Date: 2020-04-02; Offense Date: 2020-02-16; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Count: 4; Statute: 893.147(1); Offense Date: 2020-02-16; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeDescription: FELONY FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE-3RD DEG; Count: 3; Statute: 316.1935(2); Offense Date: 2020-02-16; Citation: ACLQP8E; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeDescription: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANCELED, SUSPENDED OR REVOKED 2ND OR SUBSEQUENT OFFENSE; Count: 2; Statute: 322.34(2b1); Offense Date: 2020-02-16; Citation: ACLQP7E; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF FIREARM BY FELON - POSS; Count: 1; Statute: 790.23(1a); Offense Date: 2020-02-16; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-02-28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 200024152

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OUTLAW, HILLRA CHRISTOPHER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REIDER, NICHOLAS D