This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/07/2020 at 04:35:21 (UTC).

ELLISON, MEGHAN A

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 ELLISON, MEGHAN A was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Defendant

ELLISON, MEGHAN A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

WASHO SPIVEY, JAIMIE C

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

02/26/2020: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

INFORMATION FILED

02/14/2020: INFORMATION FILED

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

01/28/2020: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

01/03/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

01/02/2020: ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION)

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

02/09/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA

12/27/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ENTRY OF NOT GUILTY PLEA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

12/18/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

BOND - AMOUNT $500.00, CASH; Count: 1

12/16/2019: BOND - AMOUNT $500.00, CASH; Count: 1

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

12/11/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

12/11/2019: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION

12/11/2019: VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION

NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

12/11/2019: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT; **NO VICTIM CONTACT**

12/11/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT; **NO VICTIM CONTACT**

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 100.0; Balance: 100.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Discretionary Court Costs; Amount Due: 200.0; Balance: 200.0; Due Date: 2020-09-08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: CASH BOND ROUTING/REFUND SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 4/1/2020 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION; Text: PTI / Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Probation #Supervision Fee (In & Out of County); Amount Due: 350.0; Balance: 350.0; Due Date: 2020-03-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 2/12/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM; Text: PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 2/12/2020 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • BondBond #: 00162343; Type: Cash; Count: 1; Depositor: KEVIN DOUGLAS PIPPIN; Closed Date: 2020-03-06; Amount: 500.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT; Text: **NO VICTIM CONTACT**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: 784.03(1A1) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE; Text: 784.03(1a1); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • ChargeDescription: BATTERY; Disposition: PTI / Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1; Statute: 784.03; Disposition Date: 2020-03-06; Offense Date: 2019-12-10; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190158429

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASHO SPIVEY, JAIMIE C