This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 14:11:31 (UTC).

DURRANCE, MARKUS

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 DURRANCE, MARKUS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

DURRANCE, MARKUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STACK, NICHOLAS E

MOSLEY, DAN R

 

Court Documents

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/26/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; ** NO GOOD ADDRESS FOR DEFT.**

04/27/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; ** NO GOOD ADDRESS FOR DEFT.**

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS/NOT SENT**

12/07/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS/NOT SENT**

RETURN OF SERVICE

04/12/2018 RETURN OF SERVICE

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/05/2018 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS FOR DEFT.**

03/30/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS FOR DEFT.**

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

12/12/2017 MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/22/2019 NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS/NOT SENT**

11/09/2018 NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN; **NO GOOD ADDRESS/NOT SENT**

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketDescription: JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER 2018-56-A DATED 05/21/2019; Text: BRIGGS, DON F SINGELTARY, G RICHARD Per Admin Order 2018-56-A dated 05/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5232; Page: 1320

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER OF PROBATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: DFB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days Probation Time: 4 years; Sentence: Probation; Credit Time: Credit Time: 2 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2019-01-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Costs of Incarceration (960.293); Amount Due: 18200.0; Balance: 18200.0; Due Date: 2019-01-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Preparation & Satisfaction Fee ($17); Amount Due: 17.0; Balance: 17.0; Due Date: 2020-01-28; In Judgement: 2019-01-28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
153 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • BondBond #: A15-2211963; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: ALTMAN BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: American Contractors Indemnity Company Bail USA, Inc.; Closed Date: 2019-01-28; Amount: 10000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2017-12-07; Amount: 10000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 170167763

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CAPIAS ISSUED; Text: Capias

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: APPLICATION AND ORDER SETTING BAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • ChargeDescription: AGGRAVATED BATTERY - GREAT BODILY HARM - W/FIREARM - POSS/DISCHRG/INJ; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 784.045(1a1); Disposition Date: 2019-01-28; Offense Date: 2017-09-22; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: FS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2019-01-28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSLEY, DAN R

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICHOLAS STACK