This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 10:47:33 (UTC).

DUNCAN, DONALD LEE

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 DUNCAN, DONALD LEE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SEMENTO, LAWRENCE J

 

Party Details

Defendant

DUNCAN, DONALD LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SLAYMAKER, NATHAN

TREMEL, MICHAEL TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

10/30/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

BOND DISCHARGED

10/10/2017 BOND DISCHARGED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

10/09/2017 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

02/07/2018

FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2018-02-07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2017

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: LJS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2017

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: LJS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2017

DocketDescription: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2017

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5024; Page: 1414

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2017

DocketDescription: Cancelled CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER on 11/27/2017 9:00:00 AM due to DEFT SNT 11.02.17

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

HearingEvent Type: CFRD - ROCKET DOCKET; Location: TAVARES; Room: LJS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2017-11-02; In Judgement: 2017-11-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2017

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2017-11-02; In Judgement: 2017-11-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
06/08/2017

DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

BondBond #: BB - 5586527; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: ELLRODT BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Accredited Surety and Casualty Company Inc; Closed Date: 2017-10-02; Amount: 2000.0; Forfeiture Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2017-11-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 7/5/2017 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM LAW, WILLIAM G; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 7/5/2017 8:30 AM LAW, WILLIAM G

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

DocketDescription: 322.34(5) DWLS W/ KNOWLEDGE- HABITUAL; Text: 322.34(5); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; Text: A164QNP 6/6/2017 TAVARES POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2017

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2017

ChargeDescription: NO VALID DRIVERS LICENSE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 322.03(1); Disposition Date: 2017-11-02; Offense Date: 2017-06-06; Citation: A164QNP; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2017-11-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2017

ArrestArresting Agency: TAVARES POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C60; Incident #: T17060306

[+] Read More [-] Read Less