This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/25/2022 at 15:37:24 (UTC).

DEMPSEY, DANIEL LUTHER, DEMPSEY, DANNY LUTHER Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2002 DEMPSEY, DANIEL LUTHER, DEMPSEY, DANNY LUTHER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendants

DEMPSEY, DANIEL LUTHER

DEMPSEY, DANNY LUTHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NACKE, MARK A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

01/21/2003

HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: 6; Room: COURTROOM 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2002

DocketDescription: NOLLE PROSEQUI; Text: NOLLE PROSEQUI - CT I GRAND THEFT- STATUTORY PROPERTY Attorney: BARBEE JR, DONALD C (0164119)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2002

DocketDescription: FILED:; Text: DEFT PRESENT FOR SENTENCING, REPRESENTED BY PD MARK NACKE, STATE ANNOUNCED NOLLE PROSEQUI ON CT 1, CASE CLOSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/10/2002

DocketDescription: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; Text: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS Attorney: RADA, CARY ()

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2002

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: 5; Room: COURTROOM 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2002

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER Date: 01/21/2003 Time: 9:00 am Judge: HILL, HONORABLE MARK J Location: COURTROOM 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/25/2002

DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT FOR; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT FOR PLEA DAY CASE CONT TO 01/07/03 PNC; 01/21/03 SENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2002

DocketDescription: DEFENSE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; Text: DEFENSE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY Attorney: NACKE, MARK A (354597)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2002

DocketDescription: WRITTEN NOT GUILTY PLEA; Text: WRITTEN NOT GUILTY PLEA Attorney: NACKE, MARK A (354597)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2002

DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT FOR PNC / SNT; Text: NOTICE TO DEFT FOR PNC ON 1/7/03 AT 10:30 / SNT ON 1/21/03 AT 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2002

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED; Text: INFORMATION FILED: COUNT I-GRANT THEFT/STATUTORY PROPERTY (F3)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2002

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION AND ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION AND ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2002

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE; Text: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE-BOND SET AT $2,000 CT I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2002

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT Date: 11/25/2002 Time: 8:30 am Judge: JOHNSON, HONORABLE T MICHAEL Location: COURTROOM 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2002

ArrestArresting Agency: LEESBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C1; Incident #: 02110125

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2002

ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT-STATUTORY PROPERTY; Disposition: Nolle Prosequi; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2c); Disposition Date: 2002-12-16; Offense Date: 2002-11-01; Offence Level: FT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less