This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 10:51:05 (UTC).

DELGADO, BOBBY JOE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 DELGADO, BOBBY JOE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIGGS, DON F. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRIGGS, DON F

 

Party Details

Defendant

DELGADO, BOBBY JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRIMES, VICTORIA

REIDER, NICHOLAS D

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

06/09/2017 AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

08/04/2017 NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

07/05/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/14/2017 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

09/29/2017 SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/30/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

08/04/2017 NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

SENTENCE

10/05/2017 SENTENCE

RETURN OF SERVICE

10/09/2017 RETURN OF SERVICE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-10-24

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: DFB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5010; Page: 213

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: DFB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: DFB

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 11 months 29 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 113 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2019-09-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 418.0; Balance: 418.0; Due Date: 2019-09-19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 07/05/2017 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM LAW, WILLIAM G; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 07/05/2017 8:30 AM LAW, WILLIAM G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2017-09-29; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • ArrestArresting Agency: CLERMONT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C3; Incident #: 17C13506

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2C) GRAND THEFT; Text: 812.014(2c); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT - STATUTORY PROPERTY; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2c); Disposition Date: 2017-09-29; Offense Date: 2017-04-24; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2017-09-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIMES, VICTORIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REIDER, NICHOLAS D