This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 18:11:24 (UTC).

DELAHOZ, JAVIER ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2019 DELAHOZ, JAVIER ALBERTO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

DELAHOZ, JAVIER ALBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VONER, DANIEL

BONIFACINO, BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

01/24/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM CONTRACT

01/23/2020: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM CONTRACT

BOND DISCHARGED

01/23/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

01/21/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

01/21/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

12/27/2019: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

12/23/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/11/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

11/25/2019: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

11/05/2019 WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Bankers Insurance Company; Count: 1

11/04/2019 BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Bankers Insurance Company; Count: 1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

11/04/2019 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/04/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Bench Warrant

10/30/2019 BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Bench Warrant

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

10/30/2019 AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) on 2/11/2020 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER on 2/18/2020 9:00:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - CF PTI Discretionary Fine (no surcharge); Amount Due: 250.0; Balance: 250.0; Due Date: 2021-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 150.0; Balance: 150.0; Due Date: 2021-07-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PRE-TRIAL INTERVENTION PROGRAM CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION; Text: PTI / Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: NO PLEA ENTERED; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY Bankers Insurance Company; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 11/25/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 11/25/2019 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190133657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2019-11-05; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2C3) GRAND THEFT; Text: 812.014(2c3); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT- $750 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20 000; Disposition: PTI / Pre-Trial Diversion; Count: 1; Statute: 812.014(2C1); Disposition Date: 2020-01-23; Offense Date: 2019-10-07; Offence Level: FT; Plea: No Plea Entered; Plea Date: 2020-01-23

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VONER, DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONIFACINO, BRADLEY