This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 00:15:26 (UTC).

COX, AMBER

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 COX, AMBER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

COX, AMBER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARRANZA, MORRIS

VONER, DANIEL

BONIFACINO, BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

03/16/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM

02/24/2020: STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

02/24/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

02/21/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

02/21/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/18/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/10/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

11/12/2019 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

10/21/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

02/24/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

02/21/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM

02/21/2020: STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM

BOND DISCHARGED

02/24/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

12/27/2019: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

12/23/2019: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

INFORMATION FILED

11/07/2019: INFORMATION FILED

BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 1

10/29/2019: BOND - AMOUNT $2,000.00, COMPANY U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; Count: 1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/21/2019: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFTRIAL - TRIAL; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPTC - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING CASES FOR CRIMINAL JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; Text: # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFTRIAL - TRIAL DOCKET 4/20/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R; Text: CFTRIAL - TRIAL 4/20/2020 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 11/12/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 11/12/2019 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2019-10-30; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Application Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Balance: 50.0; Due Date: 2019-10-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2)(C)(6) GRAND THEFT MOTOR VEHICLE; Text: 812.014(2)(C)(6); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FAILURE TO RETURN LEASED PROPERTY 3RD DEGREE; Count: 1; Statute: 812.155(3); Offense Date: 2019-10-18; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190137301

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRANZA, MORRIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VONER, DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONIFACINO, BRADLEY