This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 12/27/2022 at 09:44:53 (UTC).

COULLIETTE, AMANDA DORIS

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 COULLIETTE, AMANDA DORIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, SARAH J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, SARAH J

 

Party Details

Defendant

COULLIETTE, AMANDA DORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BARKER, VIVIONNE N

 

Court Documents

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

11/28/2022: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING; Location: TAVARES; Room: SJJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE; Location: TAVARES; Room: SJJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING on 1/30/2023 1:30:00 PM due to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE on 1/18/2023 1:30:00 PM due to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: SET ON SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING DOCKET 1/30/2023 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM; Text: SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING 1/30/2023 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 1/18/2023 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM; Text: PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 1/18/2023 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: INVESTIGATIVE COST REPORT; Text: $175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • ChargeDescription: NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Count: 1; Statute: 893.147(1); Offense Date: 2022-11-24; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2022-12-06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Open

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LEESBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C1; Incident #: 22110396

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKER, VIVIONNE N