This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 10:17:18 (UTC).

COCHRAN III, BOBBY ALLEN

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 COCHRAN III, BOBBY ALLEN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LAW, WILLIAM G. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LAW, WILLIAM G

 

Party Details

Defendant

COCHRAN III, BOBBY ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL

HAWTHORNE, CANDACE A

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS, AND FINES (CERTIFIED COPY FOR RECORDING); Book: 4968; Page: 249

06/29/2017 FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS, AND FINES (CERTIFIED COPY FOR RECORDING); Book: 4968; Page: 249

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/15/2017 STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

06/08/2017 INFORMATION FILED

DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

06/09/2017 DEFENSE DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

LETTER FROM CLERK TO VICTIM RE: RESTITUTION

10/26/2017 LETTER FROM CLERK TO VICTIM RE: RESTITUTION

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (CONFLICT)

05/30/2017 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (CONFLICT)

SENTENCE

07/17/2017 SENTENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/09/2017 NOTICE OF HEARING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

06/13/2017 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • HearingEvent Type: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: WGL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LETTER FROM CLERK TO VICTIM RE: RESTITUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: RESTITUTION ORDER:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDescription: RESTITUTION $5,020.00; Text: RESTITUTION $5,020.00 RESTITUTION $5, 020.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDescription: DEFT WAIVED APPEARANCE PER COUNSEL; Text: DEFT WAIVED APPEARANCE PER COUNSEL DEFT WAIVED APPEARANCE PER COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFMTN - MOTION HEARING DOCKET 10/26/2017 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM LAW, WILLIAM G; Text: CFMTN - MOTION HEARING 10/26/2017 9:00 AM LAW, WILLIAM G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2017
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2017-07-06; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 3; Closed Date: 2017-07-06; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Closed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: 806.13(1B3) CRIMINAL MISCHIEF; Text: 806.13(1b3); Count: 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: 812.014(2C1) GRAND THEFT; Text: 812.014(2c1); Count: 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • DocketDescription: 810.02(4A) BURGLARY TO A STRUCTURE; Text: 810.02(4A); Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • ChargeDescription: CRIMINAL MISCHIEF; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 3; Statute: 806.13(1b3); Disposition Date: 2017-06-29; Offense Date: 2017-05-04; Sentence: Community Control; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2017-06-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • ChargeDescription: GRAND THEFT-$300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20,000; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 812.014(2c1); Disposition Date: 2017-06-29; Offense Date: 2017-05-04; Sentence: Community Control; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2017-06-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • ChargeDescription: BURGLARY OF A STRUCTURE DAMAGE GREATER THAN 1000 WHILE WEARING A MASK; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 810.02(2c2); Disposition Date: 2017-06-29; Offense Date: 2017-05-04; Sentence: Community Control; Offence Level: FF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2017-06-29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWTHORNE, CANDACE A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL