This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 01/30/2023 at 05:19:35 (UTC).

COCHRAN III, BOBBY A

Case Summary

On 01/27/2023 COCHRAN III, BOBBY A was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, SARAH J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, SARAH J

 

Party Details

Defendant

COCHRAN III, BOBBY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/15/2023

HearingEvent Type: ARJ - ARRAIGNMENT JONES; Location: TAVARES; Room: SJJ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: 832.05(2)(A) ISSUING A WORTHLESS CHECK (MI); Text: 832.05(2)(A); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: 832.05(2)(A) ISSUING A WORTHLESS CHECK (MI); Text: 832.05(2)(A); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: SET ON ARJ - ARRAIGNMENT JONES DOCKET 03/15/2023 BEGINNING AT 8:00 AM; Text: ARJ - ARRAIGNMENT JONES 03/15/2023 8:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023

DocketDescription: DIRECT FILE REQUESTED BY SAO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

ChargeDescription: ISSUING A WORTHLESS CHECK (MI); Count: 2; Statute: 832.05(2)(A); Offense Date: 2022-09-20; Offence Level: MF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

ChargeDescription: ISSUING A WORTHLESS CHECK (MI); Count: 1; Statute: 832.05(2)(A); Offense Date: 2022-09-20; Offence Level: MF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less