This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 14:04:40 (UTC).

CASTILLO, JOSHUA MARC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 CASTILLO, JOSHUA MARC was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HILL, MARK J and METZ, LARRY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HILL, MARK J

METZ, LARRY

 

Party Details

Defendant

CASTILLO, JOSHUA MARC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL

KAIGLE, CHRISTOPHER R

JOHNSON, KAYLA DANIELLE

 

Court Documents

ORDER; ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE

02/26/2020: ORDER; ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

02/24/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

02/03/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

02/03/2020: NOTICE TO PRODUCE

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/03/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

INFORMATION FILED

01/21/2020: INFORMATION FILED

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

01/10/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

01/10/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

01/09/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

BOND DISCHARGED

04/05/2021: BOND DISCHARGED

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

03/08/2021: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/08/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/08/2021: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

01/11/2021: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MOTION TO CONTINUE

12/21/2020: MOTION TO CONTINUE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/24/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

09/21/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/24/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAID $200.00 ON RECEIPT 2633422, BALANCE DUE: $720.00; Text: $200.00 2633422 Balance Due: $720.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2633422; Text: 2633422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 2633421, BALANCE DUE: $720.00; Text: $300.00 2633421 Balance Due: $720.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: REVISED, RECEIPT NUMBER 2633421; Text: 2633421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • SentenceTerm: Probation Time: 12 months; Sentence: Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - CF Discretionary Fine (no surcharge); Amount Due: 300.0; Amount Paid: 300.0; Due Date: 2021-04-15; In Judgement: 2021-04-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Preparation & Satisfaction Fee ($17); Amount Due: 17.0; Balance: 17.0; Due Date: 2021-04-15; In Judgement: 2021-04-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 100.0; Balance: 100.0; Due Date: 2021-04-06

    Read MoreRead Less
137 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / DEFT DECLINED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: FIRST APPEARANCE REFUSAL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - NOT APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2020-01-14; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: MASCOTTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C50; Incident #: 19MA07593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(1A2) CULTIVATION OF CANNABIS; Text: 893.13(1a2); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF CANNABIS - 20 GRAMS OR LESS; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld by Judge; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2021-04-05; Offense Date: 2019-12-21; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-04-05

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOTI, BRIAN MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAIGLE CHRISTOPHER R