This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/29/2022 at 14:01:47 (UTC).

BYERS, CORY ADAM

Case Summary

On 10/01/2003 BYERS, CORY ADAM was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER, DONNA F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER, DONNA F

 

Party Details

Defendant

BYERS, CORY ADAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2004

DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION; Text: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2004

DocketDescription: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION; Text: CONFIDENTIAL DEFENDANT INFORMATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

HearingEvent Type: SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING; Location: 2; Room: COURTROOM 2; Notes: SENTENCED ON 06/25/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: SENTENCED TO URINALYSIS SCREENING; Text: SENTENCED TO URINALYSIS SCREENING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: ORDER ASSESSING CHARGES, COSTS, FINES AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT (IF INDICATED) TO BE RECORDED; Text: ORDER ASSESSING CHARGES, COSTS, FINES AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT (IF INDICATED) TO BE RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT; Text: WRITTEN PLEA AGREEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT FOR; Text: DEFENDANT PRESENT FOR SENTENCING, WRITTEN PLEA. REPRESENTED BY APD. PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE WAS TENDERED AS TO VOP BOTH COUNTS. JUDGE MILLER ADJUDICATED GUILTY AS TO VOP BOTH COUNTS. SENTENCED AS TO BOTH COUNTS; FINE OF $180.00 & $180.00. 30 DAYS SUSPENDED UPON PAYMENT OF ALL CONDITIONS COMPLETED. SPECIAL CONDITIONS: STOP PROGRAM, $190.00 SUPERVISION FEES OR PROOF OF PAYMENT; PAY FOR COMPLETE URINALYSIS SCREENING; MANDATORY COSTS $18.00, $125.00, $15.00, AND $48.00 INV COSTS. TERMINATE PROBATION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: COMPLETION CERTIFICATE FOR STOP PROGRAM; Text: COMPLETION CERTIFICATE FOR STOP PROGRAM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2004

DocketDescription: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS; Text: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2004

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING; Location: 2; Room: COURTROOM 2; Notes: CANCELLED ON 06/24/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
10/15/2003

DocketDescription: MISDEMEANOR $15.00 DRUG AND ALCOHOL COST; Text: MISDEMEANOR $15.00 DRUG AND ALCOHOL COST Receipt: 953431 Date: 04/16/2004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2003

DocketDescription: FCCA MISDEMEANOR 5% SURCHARGE; Text: FCCA MISDEMEANOR 5% SURCHARGE Charge #1: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS Receipt: 953431 Date: 04/16/2004; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2003

DocketDescription: LOCAL LAW ENFC EDU TRUST; Text: LOCAL LAW ENFC EDU TRUST Charge #1: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS Receipt: 953431 Date: 04/16/2004; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2003

DocketDescription: MANDATORY COST; Text: MANDATORY COST Charge #1: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS Receipt: 953431 Date: 04/16/2004; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2003

DocketDescription: INVESTIGATIVE COST REPORT; Text: INVESTIGATIVE COST REPORT $48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2003

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT FILED; Text: AFFIDAVIT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2003

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: ARRAIGNMENT MILLER Date: 10/15/2003 Time: 8:30 am Judge: MILLER, HONORABLE DONNA F Location: COURTROOM 2 Charge #1: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2003

ChargeDescription: NARCOTIC EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2004-06-25; Offense Date: 2003-09-26; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2004-06-25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2003

ChargeDescription: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2004-06-25; Offense Date: 2003-09-26; Offence Level: MF; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2004-06-25

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2003

ArrestArresting Agency: MASCOTTE POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C50; Incident #: 0309474

[+] Read More [-] Read Less