This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 06:15:37 (UTC).

BYARS, BRYAN

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 BYARS, BRYAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NIMETH, JASON J. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NIMETH, JASON J

 

Party Details

Defendant

BYARS, BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

VAN HAASTEREN, MARK WILLIAM

REGIONAL-COUNSEL, A

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING CASES RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

12/31/2019: ORDER SETTING CASES RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP

12/20/2019: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR TRIAL & COP

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

12/09/2019: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/08/2019: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

11/22/2019: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

INFORMATION FILED

11/20/2019: INFORMATION FILED

DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

11/20/2019: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

11/04/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; (DEMAND FOR)

10/29/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; (DEMAND FOR)

ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

10/28/2019: ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED BY THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

10/25/2019: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FILED BY THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

MOTION; FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

10/29/2019 MOTION; FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT

10/09/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - PTC - PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: 1B; Room: COURTROOM 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES; Book: 5420; Page: 1248

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPR - FELONY SENTENCING PRIV ATTY; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: Time Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Lien; Amount Due: 200.0; Balance: 200.0; Due Date: 2020-02-18; In Judgement: 2020-02-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 100.0; Balance: 100.0; Due Date: 2020-02-18; In Judgement: 2020-02-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording & Satisfaction Fees ($22); Amount Due: 22.0; Balance: 22.0; Due Date: 2020-02-18; In Judgement: 2020-02-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Standard/Mandatory Cost; Amount Due: 223.0; Balance: 223.0; Due Date: 2020-02-18; In Judgement: 2020-02-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY FILED BY PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PNA - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING DOCKET 11/20/2019 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM; Text: PNA - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING 11/20/2019 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • DocketDescription: SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 11/6/2019 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM; Text: PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 11/6/2019 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS / INCOMPLETE / UNABLE TO DETERMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: 843.02 RESIST OFFICER-OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; Text: 843.02; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2020-02-10; Offense Date: 2019-10-08; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-02-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190133098

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, TERRY JAMES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN HAASTEREN, MARK WILLIAM