This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 14:58:21 (UTC).

BUCHANAN, PATRICK EDWARD

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 BUCHANAN, PATRICK EDWARD was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVIS, HEIDI, HILL, MARK J and METZ, LARRY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVIS, HEIDI

HILL, MARK J

METZ, LARRY

 

Party Details

Defendant

BUCHANAN, PATRICK EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COSDEN, KAITLIN

GREENE, WANDA

ANDERSON, NEQUOSHA N

REGIONAL-COUNSEL, A

 

Court Documents

SENTENCE

01/25/2021: SENTENCE

WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

01/14/2021: WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND AGREEMENT TO ENTER PLEA

MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

08/06/2020: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

DEFENSE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; DEMAND FOR

08/06/2020: DEFENSE NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; DEMAND FOR

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

02/14/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

02/10/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/10/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

02/07/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

02/07/2020: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

SCHEDULING LETTER

01/15/2020: SCHEDULING LETTER

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

01/14/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.341, $0.00; A1DLIWE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.341 $0.00; Count: 1

01/14/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.341, $0.00; A1DLIWE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.341 $0.00; Count: 1

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.192(1A), $0.00; A1DLIXE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.192(1a) $0.00; Count: 4

01/14/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.192(1A), $0.00; A1DLIXE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.192(1a) $0.00; Count: 4

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTRC - FELONY SENTENCING REGIONAL COUNSEL; Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCRC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (RC); Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5630; Page: 1567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO THE CUSTODY OF DEPT OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CFRD - ROCKET DOCKET; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 30 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 368 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 30 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 368 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 30 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 368 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • SentenceConfinement: State Prison; Term: Jail Time: 34 months; Credit Time: Credit Time: 368 days

    Read MoreRead Less
203 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: 322.341 DRIVING WHILE LICENSE PERMANENTLY REVOKED; Text: 322.34(1); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.341, $0.00; Text: A1DLIWE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 322.341 $0.00; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.192(1A), $0.00; Text: A1DLIXE 1/13/2020 FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT 316.192(1a) $0.00; Count: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeDescription: RECKLESS DRIVING 1ST OFFENSE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 4; Statute: 316.192(2a); Disposition Date: 2021-01-14; Offense Date: 2020-01-13; Citation: A1DLIXE; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeDescription: RESIST LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER W/OUT VIOLENCE; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 3; Statute: 843.02; Disposition Date: 2021-01-14; Offense Date: 2020-01-13; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2021-01-14; Offense Date: 2020-01-13; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeDescription: DRIVING WHILE LICENSE PERMANENTLY REVOKED; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 322.341; Disposition Date: 2021-01-14; Offense Date: 2020-01-13; Citation: A1DLIWE; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2021-01-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: FRUITLAND PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C2; Incident #: 20FR00606

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, WANDA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COSDEN, KAITLIN