This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 04/08/2021 at 14:03:31 (UTC).

BUCH, TIMOTHY BRIAN

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 BUCH, TIMOTHY BRIAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

BUCH, TIMOTHY BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GROSSENBACHER, WILLIAM L

SINGELTARY II, GEORGE LEE

MACOMBER, KAITLYN

 

Court Documents

ORDER; ON STIPULATED MOTION TO ALLOW NON-VIOLENT CONTACT

04/13/2020: ORDER; ON STIPULATED MOTION TO ALLOW NON-VIOLENT CONTACT

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

03/11/2020: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

03/02/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

BOND DISCHARGED

02/14/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; 2

02/14/2020: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; 2

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

02/03/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; (AMENDED)

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; (AMENDED)

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

01/09/2020: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

01/09/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

08/05/2020: SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

08/05/2020: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

PAID $50.72 ON RECEIPT 2575526, BALANCE DUE: $823.00 REVISED PAYMENT; $50.72 2575526 Balance Due: $823.00

08/05/2020: PAID $50.72 ON RECEIPT 2575526, BALANCE DUE: $823.00 REVISED PAYMENT; $50.72 2575526 Balance Due: $823.00

PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE; PAYMENT PLAN CREATED FOR: $49.00-MONTHLY BEGINNING 09/08/2020

08/05/2020: PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE; PAYMENT PLAN CREATED FOR: $49.00-MONTHLY BEGINNING 09/08/2020

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

08/05/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

BOND DISCHARGED

08/05/2020: BOND DISCHARGED

NOTICE OF SENTENCING

07/31/2020: NOTICE OF SENTENCING

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/03/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

01/09/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: PAID $823.00 ON RECEIPT 2609869, FULLY PAID; Text: $823.00 2609869 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: PETITION AND ORDER FOR TERMINATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: COUNTY PROBATION FINANCIAL COST MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - * Credit Card Convenience Fee; Amount Due: 2.63; Amount Paid: 2.63; Due Date: 2020-09-01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: PAID $77.63 ON RECEIPT 2581459, BALANCE DUE: $1,428.00; Text: $77.63 2581459 Balance Due: $1,428.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Book: 5521; Page: 2154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $50.72 ON RECEIPT 2575526, BALANCE DUE: $1,503.00; Text: $50.72 2575526 Balance Due: $1,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 2/3/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 2/3/2020 8:30 AM DAVIS, HEIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: 787.02(1A) FALSE IMPRISONMENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Text: 787.02(1a); Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: 784.045(1B) BATTERY ON A PREGNANT FEMALE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Text: 784.045(1b); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • ChargeDescription: FALSE IMPRISONMENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 2; Statute: 787.02(1a); Disposition Date: 2020-02-14; Offense Date: 2020-01-08; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-01-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • ChargeDescription: SIMPLE BATTERY; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 784.03; Disposition Date: 2020-08-05; Offense Date: 2020-01-08; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Nolo Contendere; Plea Date: 2020-08-05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 200008089

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSENBACHER, WILLIAM L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGELTARY II, GEORGE LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACOMBER, KAITLYN