This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 05/08/2020 at 06:45:13 (UTC).

BRUNO, NICHOLAS GEORGE

Case Summary

On 10/29/2019 BRUNO, NICHOLAS GEORGE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BAXLEY, JAMES R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BAXLEY, JAMES R

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRUNO, NICHOLAS GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARRANZA, MORRIS

VONER, DANIEL

BONIFACINO, BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

03/12/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

FAILURE TO APPEAR CAPIAS ISSUED

03/12/2020: FAILURE TO APPEAR CAPIAS ISSUED

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

02/18/2020: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

02/21/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #4

02/05/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #4

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

01/27/2020: NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

01/27/2020: NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

01/27/2020: NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

01/27/2020: NOTICE, PRAECIPE & SUBPOENA FOR TAKING DEPO

NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

01/24/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT, ATTORNEY AND BONDSMEN

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/12/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION FILED

11/22/2019: INFORMATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SCHEDULING LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER DOCKET 6/8/2020 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R; Text: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER 6/8/2020 9:00 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: SET ON CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) DOCKET 6/2/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R; Text: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) 6/2/2020 8:30 AM BAXLEY, JAMES R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: CAPIAS RETURNED; Text: SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190128611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: INFORMATIONAL ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING FOR COUNSEL - PREVIOUS PRIVATE/COURT APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6)(B) POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA LESS THAN 20; Text: 893.13(1b); Count: 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: 810.02(3C) BURGLARY TO UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE; Text: 810.02(3c); Count: 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: 893.147(1) POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: 893.13(6A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Text: 893.13(6a); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ChargeDescription: PETIT THEFT- STOLEN PROPERTY/LESS THAN $100; Count: 5; Statute: 812.014(3)(a); Offense Date: 2019-10-04; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF CANNABIS- 20 GRAMS OR LESS; Count: 4; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Offense Date: 2019-10-04; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ChargeDescription: TRESPASS TO STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE; Count: 3; Statute: 810.08(2a); Offense Date: 2019-10-04; Offence Level: MS; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Count: 2; Statute: 893.147(1); Offense Date: 2019-10-04; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Count: 1; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-10-04; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-10-15

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRANZA, MORRIS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VONER, DANIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONIFACINO, BRADLEY