This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 00:59:33 (UTC).

BRADWAY, NICHOLAS J

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 BRADWAY, NICHOLAS J was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRADWAY, NICHOLAS J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GREENE, WANDA

SMOLLER, KRISTALLE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; ***DEFT HAS NGA / NOT SENT TO DEFT***

02/14/2020: NOTICE TO DEFT AND ATTORNEY; ***DEFT HAS NGA / NOT SENT TO DEFT***

NOTICE OF HEARING; (AMENDED)

02/13/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING; (AMENDED)

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/10/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION; FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL

02/06/2020: MOTION; FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL

NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY UPON BUSINESS RECORD CERTIFICATION

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 5

01/30/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; # 5

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #4

01/21/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #4

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #3

01/21/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #3

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

01/10/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #2

STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

01/06/2020: STATE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT; #1

INFORMATION FILED

12/30/2019: INFORMATION FILED

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

12/30/2019: STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

12/06/2019: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; 8622GMP 12/5/2019 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

12/06/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; 8622GMP 12/5/2019 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(3), $0.00; 8623GMP 12/5/2019 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 316.1935(3) $0.00; Count: 2

12/06/2019: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 316.1935(3), $0.00; 8623GMP 12/5/2019 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 316.1935(3) $0.00; Count: 2

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFMTN - MOTION HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFMTN - MOTION HEARING on 3/12/2020 9:00:00 AM due to CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 04/06/2020 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: 4/6/2020 1:30 PM CFSNTPD - FELONY SENTENCING PUBLIC DEFENDER HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 03/24/2020 1:30 PM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD); Text: 3/24/2020 1:30 PM CFPNCPD - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE (PD) HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFBH - BOND HEARING; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: MOTION AND ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE AND WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF PARAPHERNALIA; Count: 9; Statute: 893.147(1); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: DRIVING W/LICENSE CANCELED/SUSPENDED/REVOKED; Count: 8; Statute: 322.34(5); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Citation: 8622GMP; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: FELONY FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE-3RD DEG; Count: 7; Statute: 316.1935(2); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Citation: 8623GMP; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF COCAINE; Count: 6; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF HYDROCODONE; Count: 5; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF BUPRENORPHINE; Count: 4; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF FENTANYL; Count: 3; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF HEROIN; Count: 2; Statute: 893.13(6a); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ChargeDescription: TRAFFICKING IN METHAMPHETAMINE; Count: 1; Statute: 893.135(1f1); Offense Date: 2019-12-05; Offence Level: FF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-12-13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 190156582

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMOLLER, KRISTALLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREENE, WANDA