This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 03/20/2020 at 17:57:15 (UTC).

BOWLING, CRYSTAL GAIL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 BOWLING, CRYSTAL GAIL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVIS, HEIDI. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVIS, HEIDI

 

Party Details

Defendant

BOWLING, CRYSTAL GAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LINEBERGER, KENNETH LOGAN

KELLY, JAMES PATRICK

 

Court Documents

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

02/21/2018 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

02/21/2018 WARRANT RETURNED; SERVED

WARRANT RETURNED; UNEXECUTED - REPLACED WITH AMENDED

02/21/2018 WARRANT RETURNED; UNEXECUTED - REPLACED WITH AMENDED

AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE; AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

02/14/2018 AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE; AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

04/23/2019 AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

04/25/2018 STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

03/19/2018 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE TO PRODUCE

02/26/2018 NOTICE TO PRODUCE

INFORMATION FILED

03/16/2018 INFORMATION FILED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/21/2019

FinancialDescription: Lake - Criminal D6 (Financial Obligation- $7); Amount Due: 7.0; Balance: 7.0; Due Date: 2019-08-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019

DocketDescription: SENTENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2019

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT; Book: 5281; Page: 2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2019

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: LJS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2019

DocketDescription: ORDER OF REVOCATION OF PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2019

HearingEvent Type: CFRD - ROCKET DOCKET; Location: TAVARES; Room: HD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2019

SentenceConfinement: County Jail; Term: Jail Time: 90 days; Credit Time: Credit Time: 20 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Cost of Prosecution 2; Amount Due: 150.0; Balance: 150.0; Due Date: 2019-07-31; In Judgement: 2019-05-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Recording Fee ($5); Amount Due: 5.0; Balance: 5.0; Due Date: 2019-07-31; In Judgement: 2019-05-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2019

FinancialDescription: #Lake - Criminal Public Defender Lien; Amount Due: 550.0; Balance: 550.0; Due Date: 2019-07-31; In Judgement: 2019-05-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
131 More Docket Entries
02/21/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: WARRANT RETURNED; Text: UNEXECUTED - REPLACED WITH AMENDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2018

BondBond #: SS-5-280445; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: THUMPER'S BAIL BONDS; Suerety Company: Sun Surety Insurance Company; Closed Date: 2018-09-11; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/2018

ArrestArresting Agency: CLERMONT POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C3; Incident #: 18C02927

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2018-02-26; Amount: 2000.0; Status: Closed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.; Text: AMENDED BENCH WARRANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018

DocketDescription: 817.61 FRAUDULENT USE OF A CREDIT CARD OVER $100 OR MORE WITHIN 6 MONTHS; Text: 817.61; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: BENCH WARRANT TO S.O.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE; Text: AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2018

ChargeDescription: FRAUDULENT USE OF PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION; Disposition: Adjudicated Guilty; Count: 1; Statute: 817.568(2A); Disposition Date: 2018-09-11; Offense Date: 2018-01-25; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Admit VOP; Plea Date: 2019-05-02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less