This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/25/2022 at 09:02:17 (UTC).

BOSTIC, PATRICIA ANN

Case Summary

On 10/01/2002 BOSTIC, PATRICIA ANN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIGGS, DON F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRIGGS, DON F

 

Party Details

Defendant

BOSTIC, PATRICIA ANN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/28/2002

HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: 4; Room: COURTROOM 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2002

DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT FOR; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT FOR PLEA DAY - ANI TO BE FILED BY SAO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2002

DocketDescription: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION; Text: ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION - CT I FELONY FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE - 3RD DEGREE Attorney: FORGIE, WALTER ()

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2002

DocketDescription: ARREST BOND POSTED; Text: ARREST BOND $5000 POSTED BY JORDAN BAIL BONDS 093002

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2002

DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION #; Text: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION # 3130-BMR / FLEE & ELUDE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2002

DocketDescription: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION AND ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER; Text: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY, APPLICATION AND ORDER APPOINTING THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2002

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE; Text: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE-BOND SET AT $5,000 CT I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2002

DocketDescription: COURT EVENT SET; Text: COURT EVENT SET Event: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT Date: 10/28/2002 Time: 8:30 am Judge: LAW, HONORABLE WILLIAM G Location: COURTROOM 4

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2002

ChargeDescription: RESIST OFFICER-HIGH SPEED VEH PURSUIT FLEE ATT TO; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 1; Statute: 316.1935(2); Disposition Date: 2002-10-22; Offense Date: 2002-09-30; Offence Level: FT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2002

BondBond #: CONV-33545494-1; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: JORDAN BAIL BONDS; Amount: 5000.0; Status: Open

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2002

ArrestArresting Agency: EUSTIS POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C4; Incident #: 02091924

[+] Read More [-] Read Less