This case was last updated from Lake County Florida Courts on 08/22/2022 at 04:44:50 (UTC).

BASTIN, TIMOTHY GLENN

Case Summary

On 10/02/2001 BASTIN, TIMOTHY GLENN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Florida Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, T MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, T MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Defendant

BASTIN, TIMOTHY GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAWTHORNE, CANDACE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/10/2003

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION; Text: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2002

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION; Text: NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF PROBATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2002

FinancialDescription: Conversion Supervision Fee; Amount Due: 50.0; Amount Paid: 50.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2002

DocketDescription: SUPERVISION FEES; Text: SUPERVISION FEES Charge #1: ASSLT Receipt: 855613 Date: 09/12/2002; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2002

DocketDescription: JUDGMENT AND FINGERPRINTS; Text: JUDGMENT (ADJUDICATION WITHHELD CTS. I & II)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2002

FinancialDescription: Conversion Supervision Fee; Amount Due: 20.0; Amount Paid: 20.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/2002

DocketDescription: SUPERVISION FEES; Text: SUPERVISION FEES Charge #1: ASSLT Receipt: 845643 Date: 07/09/2002; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2002

DocketDescription: ORDER WITHHOLDING ADJUDICATION OF GUILT / PLACING DEFT ON ADMINISTRATIVE PROBATION; Text: ORDER WITHHOLDING ADJUDICATION OF GUILT / PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION. NUNC PRO TUNC: 6/3/02

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2002

DocketDescription: INFORMATION FILED; Text: AMENDED INFORMATION FILED: CTS. I & II - ASSAULT (STATE ORALLY ADDED CT. II IN OPEN COURT ON 6/3/02 AND THIS WRITTEN AMENDED INFORMATION WAS FILED FOR THAT PURPOSE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2002

HearingEvent Type: Civil Conversion Court Event; Location: 5; Room: COURTROOM 5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
68 More Docket Entries
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: SCHEDULING LETTER TO DEFENDANT - CASE SET FOR 102901 AT 8:30 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: NOTICE TO BONDSMAN - CASE SET FOR 102901 AT 8:30 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: $5250 BAIL POSTED BY LAKE BAIL BONDS, 544 S DUNCAN DRIVE, 093001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY & APP. FOR APPOINTMENT OF PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2001

DocketDescription: Conversion Code; Text: FILED: AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2001

ChargeDescription: ASSAULT; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 3; Statute: 784.011; Disposition Date: 2001-10-25; Offense Date: 2001-09-30; Offence Level: MS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2001

ChargeDescription: ASSLT; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld by Judge; Count: 2; Statute: 784.011; Disposition Date: 2002-06-03; Offense Date: 2001-09-30; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: MS; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-06-03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2001

ChargeDescription: ASSLT; Disposition: Adjudication Withheld by Judge; Count: 1; Statute: 784.011; Disposition Date: 2002-06-03; Offense Date: 2001-09-30; Sentence: Probation; Offence Level: MS; Plea: No Contest; Plea Date: 2002-06-03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2001

BondBond #: CONV-10916289-1; Type: Surety; Count: 1; Bondsman: LAKE BAIL BONDS; Amount: 5250.0; Status: Open

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2001

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less