This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 12:54:50 (UTC).

ALLEN, BRANDY ELISE DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 ALLEN, BRANDY ELISE DANIELLE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HILL, MARK J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Lake County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HILL, MARK J

 

Party Details

Defendant

ALLEN, BRANDY ELISE DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TREMEL, MICHAEL TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

ORDER; ALLOWING NON-VIOLENT CONTACT

10/17/2019 ORDER; ALLOWING NON-VIOLENT CONTACT

REFERRED OR TRANSFERRED TO MISDEMEANOR; 1 35-2019-MM-006079-AXXX-XX

10/17/2019 REFERRED OR TRANSFERRED TO MISDEMEANOR; 1 35-2019-MM-006079-AXXX-XX

MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

10/01/2019 MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

CLERK'S WORKSHEET

10/01/2019 CLERK'S WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

09/17/2019 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY Lexington National Insurance Corporation; Count: 1

09/06/2019 BOND - AMOUNT $1,000.00, COMPANY Lexington National Insurance Corporation; Count: 1

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

09/05/2019 FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

09/05/2019 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

09/05/2019 NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

09/05/2019 INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

09/05/2019 ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

09/05/2019 ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: MJH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketDescription: Cancelled CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT on 10/21/2019 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER; Text: ALLOWING NON-VIOLENT CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: REFERRED OR TRANSFERRED TO MISDEMEANOR; Text: 1 35-2019-MM-006079-AXXX-XX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • HearingEvent Type: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: JRB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDescription: CONTINUED TO 10/21/2019 8:30 AM; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 10/21/2019 8:30 AM HILL, MARK J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketDescription: DEFT NOT PRESENT; Text: DEFT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CLERK'S WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2019
  • BondType: Set by Judge; Count: 1; Closed Date: 2019-09-10; Amount: 1000.0; Status: Closed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE VICTIM NOTIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: INVESTIGATIVE COST RECOVERY REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: 784.03(2) BATTERY SIMPLE-ONE PRIOR CONVICTION-DOMESTIC; Text: 784.03(2); Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • ArrestArresting Agency: LEESBURG POLICE DEPARTMENT; Agency Number: C1; Incident #: 19-09-0016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2019
  • ChargeDescription: BATTERY SIMPLE-ONE PRIOR CONVICTION-DOMESTIC; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 1; Statute: 784.03(2); Disposition Date: 2019-10-17; Offense Date: 2019-08-31; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2019-09-17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TREMEL, M. TAYLOR