This case was last updated from Lake County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 08:16:08 (UTC).

ALBRIDGE, ERIC SHAWN

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 ALBRIDGE, ERIC SHAWN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Lake County Courts, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SINGELTARY, G RICHARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Lake County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SINGELTARY, G RICHARD

 

Party Details

Defendant

ALBRIDGE, ERIC SHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REIDER, NICHOLAS D

 

Court Documents

FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

08/25/2020: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

08/25/2020: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

08/25/2020: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; ACLSBBE 08/24/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

08/25/2020: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; ACLSBBE 08/24/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2020

HearingEvent Type: CANCELLED - CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT; Location: TAVARES; Room: LM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020

DocketDescription: Cancelled CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT on 9/21/2020 8:30:00 AM due to CASE DISPOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2020

DocketDescription: REFERRED OR TRANSFERRED TO MISDEMEANOR; Text: 1,2,3 35-2020-MM-004499-AXXX-XX

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2020

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2020

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2020

DocketDescription: NOT GUILTY; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/26/2020

DocketDescription: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEFENDANT'S PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: SET ON CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT DOCKET 9/21/2020 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM METZ, LARRY; Text: CFARR - FELONY ARRAIGNMENT 9/21/2020 8:30 AM METZ, LARRY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: FELONY AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: 893.147(1) POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Text: 893.147(1); Count: 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: 893.13(6)(B) POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA LESS THAN 20 GRAMS; Text: 893.13(6)(b); Count: 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: 322.34(5) DWLS - HABITUAL TRAFFIC OFFENDER; Text: 322.34(5); Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: ARREST AFFIDAVIT AND ORDER DETERMINING PROBABLE CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION FILED FOR 322.34(5), $0.00; Text: ACLSBBE 08/24/2020 LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE 322.34(5) $0.00; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 3; Statute: 893.147(1); Disposition Date: 2020-09-14; Offense Date: 2020-08-24; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-08-26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020

ChargeDescription: POSSESSION OF MARIJUANA LESS THAN 20 GRAMS; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 2; Statute: 893.13(6)(b); Disposition Date: 2020-09-14; Offense Date: 2020-08-24; Offence Level: MF; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-08-26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020

ChargeDescription: DWLS - HABITUAL TRAFFIC OFFENDER; Disposition: Announcement of No Information; Count: 1; Statute: 322.34(5); Disposition Date: 2020-09-14; Offense Date: 2020-08-24; Offence Level: FT; Plea: Not Guilty; Plea Date: 2020-08-26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020

ArrestArresting Agency: LAKE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE; Agency Number: LC; Incident #: 200098387

[+] Read More [-] Read Less