This case was last updated from Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/21/2023 at 14:21:14 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, SHANNON VS CRE NIAGRA HOLDINGS LLC DBA EXPLORIA RESORTS

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 WILLIAMS, SHANNON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRE NIAGRA HOLDINGS LLC DBA EXPLORIA RESORTS. This case was filed in Lake County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Lake County Courthouse located in Lake, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TAKAC, MICHAEL G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Lake, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TAKAC, MICHAEL G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, SHANNON

Defendant

CRE NIAGRA HOLDINGS LLC DBA EXPLORIA RESORTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATERS, IMANI JERE'

Defendant Attorney

HIGGINS, HUGH D

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

01/13/2023: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION; 03/31/2023 AT 1:00 PM

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF MEDIATION; 03/31/2023 AT 1:00 PM

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

12/15/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

12/12/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/10/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

08/25/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/19/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

MOTION

07/20/2022: MOTION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

07/19/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; 08/10/2022 AT 10:00 AM

07/13/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; 08/10/2022 AT 10:00 AM

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

06/01/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/25/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/12/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/14/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF MEDIATION; Text: 03/31/2023 AT 1:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Text: 08/10/2022 AT 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2721916, FULLY PAID; Text: $10.00 2721916 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: MOTION; Text: TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS FILED BY CRE NIAGARA HOLDINGS LLC D/B/A EXPLORIA RESORTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Summons Fee; Amount Due: 10.0; Amount Paid: 10.0; Due Date: 2022-02-18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Lake - Circuit Civil Filing Fee; Amount Due: 400.0; Amount Paid: 400.0; Due Date: 2022-02-18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRE NIAGRA HOLDINGS LLC DBA EXPLORIA RESORTS,; Text: CRE NIAGRA HOLDINGS LLC DBA EXPLORIA RESORTS,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: PAID $410.00 ON RECEIPT 2715474, FULLY PAID; Text: $410.00 2715474 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less